5 Useful Tricks for Mathematics Here are 5 fast math strategies students (and adults!) can use to do math in their heads. Once these strategies are mastered, students should be able to accurately and confidently solve math problems that they once feared solving.

A. 10 and 11 times tricks The trick to multiplying any number by 10 is to add a zero to the end of the number. For example, 62 x 10 = 620. There is also an easy trick for multiplying any two-digit number by 11. Here it is: 11 x 25 Take the original two-digit number and put a space between the digits. In this example, that number is 25. 2_5 Now add those two numbers together and put the result in the center: 2_(2 + 5)_5 2_7_5 The answer to 11 x 25 is 275. If the numbers in the center add up to a number with two digits, insert the second number and add 1 to the first one. Here is an example for the equation 11 x 88 8_(8 +8)_8 (8 + 1)_6_8 9_6_8 There is the answer to 11 x 88: 968

B. Percentage Finding a percentage of a number can be somewhat tricky, but thinking about it in the right terms makes it much easier to understand. For instance, to find out what 5% of 235 are, follow this method: •

Step 1: Move the decimal point over by one place, 235 becomes 23.5.

•

Step 2: Divide 23.5 by the number 2, the answer is 11.75. That is also the answer to the original equation.

C. Quickly square a two-digit number that ends in 5 Let’s use the number 35 as an example. •

Step 1: Multiply the first digit by itself plus 1.

•

Step 2: Put a 25 at the end.

35 squared = [3 x (3 + 1)] & 25 [3 x (3 + 1)] = 12 12 & 25 = 1225 35 squared = 1225

D. Tough multiplication When multiplying large numbers, if one of the numbers is even, divide the first number in half, and then double the second number. This method will solve the problem quickly. For instance, consider 20 x 120 Step 1: Divide the 20 by 2, which equals 10. Double 120, which equals 240. Then multiply your two answers together. 10 x 240 = 2400 The answer to 20 x 120 is 2,400.

E. Multiplying numbers that end in zero Multiplying numbers that end in zero is actually quite simple. It involves multiplying the other numbers together and then adding the zeros at the end. For instance, consider: 200 x 400 Step 1: Multiply the 2 times the 4 2x4=8 Step 2: Put all four of the zeros after the 8 80,000 200 x 400= 80,000

Practicing these fast math tricks can help both students and teachers improve their math skills and become secure in their knowledge of mathematicsâ€”and unafraid to work with numbers in the future. If you want to learn more tips and tricks then you must join Star Home Tuitions. We provide the Best Maths Tuition in Jalandhar. We have well-educated trainers. Our skilled faculty members help the candidate to reach their goals in a specific period of time with their intense knowledge and expertise in the exam. For more details please log on to our website www.startutorials.in Contact: +91-98760-38173/85660-06700. Address: 115-116A second floor 2nd office, Gurjaipal Nagar, Cool Road, New Jawahar Nagar, Jalandhar, Punjab 144001

Best Maths Tuition in Jalandhar

If you have to take in more tips and traps then you should join Star Home Tuitions. We give the Best Maths Tuition in Jalandhar. We have ach...

Best Maths Tuition in Jalandhar

Published on Jul 11, 2018

If you have to take in more tips and traps then you should join Star Home Tuitions. We give the Best Maths Tuition in Jalandhar. We have ach...

Advertisement